Stock | Role | Class | Num Shares | Value | Price $ | Report Date | Ownership |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oncotelic Therapeutics, Inc. | Chief Business Officer | Common Stock | 16.5M | $428K | $0.03 | Jul 8, 2021 | Direct |
Oncotelic Therapeutics, Inc. | Chief Business Officer | Stock Options | 675K | Sep 3, 2021 | Direct | ||
Oncotelic Therapeutics, Inc. | Chief Business Officer | Series A Convertible Preferred Stock | 0 | Mar 31, 2021 | Direct |
Symbol | Company | Period | Transactions | Value $ | Form Type | Date Filed | Role |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OTLC | Oncotelic Therapeutics, Inc. | Sep 3, 2021 | 1 | $0 | 4 | Sep 8, 2021 | Chief Business Officer |
OTLC | Oncotelic Therapeutics, Inc. | Mar 31, 2021 | 4 | $0 | 4 | Jul 16, 2021 | CHIEF BUSINESS OFFICER |