Insiders | Shares | % | Avg Price | Total $ | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Buys | 1 | +250K | 81% | $0.41 | +$103K |
Sells | 1 | -58.5K | 19% | $0.38 | -$22.5K |
Net | 0 | +192K | 62.1% | +$80K |
Name | Relationship | Holdings Value | Past Year Net Change | Change % | Report Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
General Resonance LLC | 10%+ Owner | $6.06M | -$22.5K | -0.37% | Apr 30, 2024 |
Chidozie Ugwumba | Resigned as director 2/15/2023, 10%+ Owner | $5.34M | Jun 16, 2023 | ||
Alison Mosca | Director | $3.18M | Jun 7, 2024 | ||
David J. Matlin | Director | $2.95M | +$103K | +3.6% | Jun 7, 2024 |
John Henry Stevens | Director | $373K | Sep 18, 2023 | ||
Jonathon Gay | Director | $71.5K | Jun 7, 2024 | ||
Robert Dee Etherington | Chief Executive Officer, Director | $12.7K | Aug 16, 2024 | ||
Arjun JJ Desai | Director | $6.68K | Jun 7, 2024 | ||
Robert Glanzman | Chief Medical Officer | $4.33K | May 16, 2022 | ||
Matthew Kiernan | Director | $3.5K | Jun 7, 2024 | ||
Tae Heum Jeong | Chief Finance Officer | Nov 4, 2021 | |||
Fiona Costello | Director | May 18, 2021 | |||
Mark Mortenson | Chief Science Officer | Aug 16, 2024 | |||
Shalom Jacobovitz | Director | Jun 7, 2024 | |||
Vallerie McLaughlin | Director | Jun 7, 2024 | |||
Morgan R. Brown | Chief Financial Officer | Aug 16, 2024 | |||
Reed N. Wilcox | Director | Jun 7, 2024 |
Insider | Symbol | Class | Transaction | % | Value $ | * Price $ | Shares | Shares Owned | Date | Ownership |
---|